EP1096360 - Intelligent power management for distributed processing systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'Inverno, Dominique Benoit Jacques 47, chemin des Basses Ginestières 06270 Villeneuve-Loubet / FR | 02 /
Chauvel, Gérard Val Bosquet, 292, Chemin du Val Bosquet Ville Numéro 20, 06600 Antibes / FR | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2001/18] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited, European Patents Department (MS 13), PO Box 5069 Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99402655.7 | 25.10.1999 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1096360 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096360 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/206 (EP,US);
G06F1/329 (EP,US);
G06F9/4893 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | Intelligente Leistungssteuerung in verteilten Verarbeitungssystemen | [2001/18] | English: | Intelligent power management for distributed processing systems | [2001/18] | French: | Méthode de gestion intelligente de puissance pour systèmes de traitement distribués | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | BE | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | CY | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | IT | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | LU | 25.10.2004 | IE | 26.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | ES | 02.01.2005 | PT | 22.02.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
CY | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
LU | 25.10.2004 | ||
IE | 26.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 26.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9411801 (HARRIS CORP [US]) [A] 12,16 * page 5, line 22 - page 8, line 17; figure 1 ** page 4, line 1 - line 13 *; | [X]EP0683451 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-13,15-19,21,22 * page 8, line 37 - page 9, line 39; figures 1-4A,6,8,13 *; | [A]EP0730217 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 12,14 * abstract *; | [X]EP0794481 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-8,10-12,15-19,21,22 * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 46 * * page 9, line 35 - line 57; figures 4,5,10,14,19 *; | [A]EP0921458 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,12,15-18,20-22 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 11; figures 2-6,8,9 * |