EP0997380 - Easy-open collapsible cardboard box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Emballage France 10, allée Rosa-Luxembourg, Eragny Parc, Boite postale 221 95614 Cergy-Pontoise Cédex / FR | [2000/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Legoff, Servan 7 avenue des Jonquilles 44260 Malville / FR | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402669.8 | 26.10.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | FR19980013557 | 27.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9813557 | [2000/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0997380 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/54 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
B65D5/542 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | Leicht zu öffnender Faltkarton | [2000/18] | English: | Easy-open collapsible cardboard box | [2000/18] | French: | Caisse en carton à ouverture et remise à plat facile | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 08.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0780311 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 29 - column 2, line 53 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE7632223U (EUROPA CARTON AG) [A] 1,12 * page 6, line 1 - page 6, line 18 * * figure 1 * |