EP1000710 - Method of mesuring and/or controlling in a fastening device including a hydropneumatic impulse screw driver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states RENAULT 34 Quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lebris, Jean-Marc Collège Léon Blum 78450 Villepreux / FR | 02 /
Jouny, Pascal 5, Rue Champlin 91170 Viry Chatillon / FR | [2000/20] | Application number, filing date | 99402779.5 | 08.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | FR19980014353 | 16.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9814353 | [2000/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000710 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000710 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B25B23/14, B25B23/145 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B25B23/1453 (EP);
B25B23/1405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2001/05] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Messen und/oder Ansteuern bei einer Schraubvorrichtung mit einem hydropneumatischen Impulsschrauber | [2000/20] | English: | Method of mesuring and/or controlling in a fastening device including a hydropneumatic impulse screw driver | [2000/20] | French: | Procédé de mesure et/ou de commande d'un équipement de vissage comprenant une visseuse hydropneumatique à martèlement | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 18.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Request for further processing for: | 20.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.03.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.01.2006 | [2008/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [T]EP0911119 (ATLAS COPCO TOOLS AB) [T] 1-6 * column 5, line 49 - line 58; figures 3C,4C,5C,6C *; | [A]DE4243069 (DEUTSCHE GARDNER-DENVER GMBH & CO) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]DE4429282 (COOPER INDUSTRIES INC.) [A] 1,4 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0724935 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1,4 * claims 1,3 * |