EP1018812 - Optical fiber WDM transmission system with chromatic dispersion compensation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2000/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rousseau, Jean-Claude 48, rue Le Val Sablon 78400 Chatou / FR | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99403318.1 | 30.12.1999 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | FR19990000006 | 04.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900006 | [2000/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018812 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018812 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
H04B10/2525 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Title | German: | Faseroptisches WDM Übertragungssystem mit Farbzerstreuungskompensation | [2000/28] | English: | Optical fiber WDM transmission system with chromatic dispersion compensation | [2000/28] | French: | Système de transmission à fibre optique à multiplexage en longueur d'onde avec compensation de la dispersion chromatique | [2000/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.02.2003 | FI | 19.02.2003 | GR | 19.02.2003 | IE | 19.02.2003 | NL | 19.02.2003 | DK | 19.05.2003 | PT | 19.05.2003 | SE | 19.05.2003 | ES | 28.08.2003 | [2004/05] |
Former [2004/02] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
FI | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
IE | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
DK | 19.05.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
FI | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 19.02.2003 | |
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 19.02.2003 | |
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 19.02.2003 | |
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 19.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5781673 (REED WILLIAM ALFRED [US], et al) [A] 1,6-8 * column 2, line 39 - line 65 * * column 4, line 52 - line 64 ** figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0877496 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,5-7 * figures 1,5; table 1 *; | [A]EP0883002 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * page 4, line 23 - line 31 * * page 6, line 18 - line 33 * * figures 2,4,5,7; table 1 * |