EP0940619 - Ceramic tube, in particular a smoke, waste or ventilation pipe, made of several pipe sections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMERYS TOITURE Parc d'Activités de Limonest, 1 rue des Vergers, Silic 3 69760 Limonest / FR | [2001/48] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states IMERYS TOITURE Parc d'Activités de Limonest, 1 rue des Verges, Silic 3 69760 Limonest / FR | ||
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states L'INDUSTRIELLE REGIONALE DU BATIMENT Parc d'activités du Limonest, Silic 5, 1 rue des Vergers 69760 Limonest / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferragut, Jean-Pierre 90, Avenue Jean Jaurès 26240 Saint Vallier / FR | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [1999/36] | Hartmann, Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau, B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99420053.3 | 01.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Priority number, date | FR19980002799 | 03.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9802799 | [1999/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0940619 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/04, F16L23/22, F16L23/036 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
F16L23/08 (EP);
F16L23/22 (EP);
F24F13/0209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, PT [2000/20] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Keramisches Rohr, insbesondere ein Rauch- oder Müllabwurf- oder Entlüftungsrohr mit unterschiedlichen Rohrelementen | [1999/36] | English: | Ceramic tube, in particular a smoke, waste or ventilation pipe, made of several pipe sections | [1999/36] | French: | Conduit, notamment conduit de fumée, comportant plusieurs éléments de conduit | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 09.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, FI, GR, LU, NL, SE | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/03] | 14.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2687208 (RENSON FRANCOIS [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, lines 19-24; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]GB775155 (PETER CURTEN) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2427539 (CEFILAC [FR]) [A] 1,3,4 * figures 1-11; claims 1-5 * | by applicant | EP0424617 |