EP1003143 - Method for automatically selecting and combining materials in a learning course by a computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2001 [2001/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hägebarth, Frank Heuchelbergstrasse 3 74366 Kirchheim / DE | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Brose, Gerhard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Brose, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99440314.5 | 16.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | DE1998152938 | 17.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19852938 | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1003143 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G09B7/04, G09B5/14 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
G09B7/04 (EP);
G09B5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Auswahl und Zusammenstellung eines Lernkurses durch einen Rechner | [2000/21] | English: | Method for automatically selecting and combining materials in a learning course by a computer | [2000/21] | French: | Procédé pour la sélection automatique de matières et la réalisation d'un cours de formation par un ordinateur | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/42] | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0838798 (NAT EDUCATION CORP) [X] 1-6,9-14,16,18-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5779486 (HO CHI FAI ET AL) [A] 1,3,4,6,10,11,13,14,16,19 * the whole document *; | [PA]US5870731 (TRIF IOAN ET AL) [PA] 1,3,4,6,7,11,14,16-18 * the whole document *; | [A]CA2195927 ; | [A]US5618182 (THOMAS C DOUGLASS) [A] 1,3-5,11,13,15,18 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2321120 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1,6,7,9,11,16,17,19,21 * the whole document * |