EP0962579 - A clothes line for use indoors with vertical movement and a guide rail with runner system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maiz Mancisidor, José Almda. Urkijo, 34-1 C Bilbao / ES | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/49] | Application number, filing date | 99500076.7 | 12.05.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | ES19980001436U | 03.06.1998 Original published format: ES 9801436 U | [1999/49] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962579 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D06F57/12 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
D06F57/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT [2000/33] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Innenstander mit vertikaler Verschiebung auf Schienen und Kufen | [1999/49] | English: | A clothes line for use indoors with vertical movement and a guide rail with runner system | [1999/49] | French: | Etendoir pour intérieur avec déplacement vertical par système de glissière et patin | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2001 | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1815737 (JUDELSON L) [Y] 1-4,8-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2736438 (FREY N E) [Y] 1-4,8-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2283205 (HARRIS W K) [A] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US1714258 (CLEVELAND A W) [A] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1282071 (PING KUEN AU D) [A] 6,7 * figure - * |