EP0961303 - A transformer assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Artesyn Technologies Youghal County Cork / IE | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rinne, Karl Monetray East, Whiting Bay Ardmore, County Waterford / IE | 02 /
Duigan, Joe Hillside, Lower Aghada Midleton, County Cork / IE | 03 /
Gaynor, Brian 1 Dun Coran, Whitebarn, Sweetfields Youghal, County Cork / IE | 04 /
Keane, Frank The Grove, Westfields, North Circular Road Limerick / IE | 05 /
Spelman, Sean 20 Oakfield Avenue Glanmire, County Cork / IE | [2003/43] |
Former [1999/51] | 01 /
Rinne, Karl Whiting Bay Ardmore, County Waterford / IE | ||
02 /
Duigan, Joe Lower Aghada Midleton, County Cork / IE | |||
03 /
Gaynor, Brian 1 Dun Coran, Whitebarn, Sweetfields Youghal, County Cork / IE | |||
04 /
Keane, Frank Westfields, North Circular Road Limerick / IE | |||
05 /
Spelman, Sean 20 Oakfield Avenue Glanmire, County Cork / IE | |||
Former [1999/48] | 01 /
Rinne, Karl Whiting Bay Ardmore, County Waterford / IE | ||
02 /
Duigan, Joe Appartment2, Old Barracks Killeagh, County Cork / IE | |||
03 /
Gaynor, Brian 1 Dun Coran, Whitebarn, Sweetfields Youghal, County Cork / IE | |||
04 /
Keane, Frank 5 Doirebeg, O'Connell Street Dungarvan, County Waterford / IE | |||
05 /
Spelman, Sean 20 Oakfield Avenue Glanmire, County Cork / IE | Representative(s) | O'Connor, Donal Henry Cruickshank 8a Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | O'Connor, Donal Henry c/o Cruickshank & Co., 1 Holles Street Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99650043.5 | 26.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | IE19980000404 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: IE 980404 | IE19980000405 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: IE 980405 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961303 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0961303 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961303 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01F30/10, H01F27/29, H01F27/02, H01F27/28 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
H05K1/165 (EP,US);
H01F27/2804 (EP,US);
H01F27/2847 (EP,US);
H05K1/0263 (EP,US);
H05K2201/086 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09063 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/48] | H01F30/10, H01F27/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2003/22] |
Former [2001/36] | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT | ||
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT | ||
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Transformatoranordnung | [1999/48] | English: | A transformer assembly | [1999/48] | French: | Dispositif transformateur | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 18.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.12.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2003 | BE | 22.10.2003 | FR | 22.10.2003 | IT | 22.10.2003 | DE | 23.01.2004 | GB | 26.05.2004 | IE | 26.05.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
FR | 22.10.2003 | ||
DE | 23.01.2004 | ||
GB | 26.05.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DE | 23.01.2004 | ||
GB | 26.05.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DE | 23.01.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DE | 23.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
DE | 23.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 22.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0291403 (BULL SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 7, lines 30-55; figure 10 * [A] 3,4; | [A]DE3721759 (CEAG LICHT & STROM [DE])[A] 11; | [A]US5598327 (SOMERVILLE THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 5,6,9,11 | Examination | US5175525 |