EP0930798 - Use of a paging channel for cell broadcast information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ranta, Jukka Tapio Ajokatu 1 24280 Salo / FI | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Brax, Matti Juhani, et al Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Brax, Matti Juhani, et al Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 99660001.1 | 04.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | FI19980000014 | 05.01.1998 Original published format: FI 980014 | FI19980001663 | 27.07.1998 Original published format: FI 981663 | [1999/29] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0930798 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0930798 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930798 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04B7/00 (KR);
H04W84/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/29] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/52] |
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gebrauch eines Funkrufkanals für zellulare Rundfunkinformationen | [2010/42] | English: | Use of a paging channel for cell broadcast information | [1999/29] | French: | Utilisation d'un canal d'appel pour diffusion d'informations cellulaires | [2010/42] |
Former [1999/29] | Gebrauch eines Funkrufkanals für zellularen Rundfunkinformationen | ||
Former [1999/29] | Utilisation d'un canal de d'appel pour diffusion d'informations cellulaires | Examination procedure | 18.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.03.2011 | [2012/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4527284 (ROETTGER KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 32 - line 61 *; | [X]EP0415502 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 30 - line 55 * * page 6, line 14 - line 26 * * figure 13 * * page 9, line 1 - line 28; figure 16 * * page 11, line 1 - line 19; figure 20 *; | [A]WO9610895 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 1, line 22 - line 31 * * page 3, line 4 - line 11 * * page 5, line 16 - line 33 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 21 * * page 7, line 35 - page 8, line 11 *; | [X]WO9736387 (AIWA CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8; | EP0891050 [ ] (AIWA CO [JP]) [ ] * page 4, line 40 - page 5, line 3 * * page 5, line 15 - line 21 * * figures 4,5,7 *; | [A] - VARMA V K ET AL, "INTEGRATED ALERTING AND SYSTEM BROADCAST CHANNEL FOR A WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19960201), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 157 - 163, XP000594678 [A] 1,7,8 * page 159, column R, line 8 - page 160, column R, line 28 * * page 160, column R, line 51 - page 161, column L, line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.481833 | [A] - MOULY M ET AL, The GSM Global System for Mobile Communications, FR,LASSAY-LES-CHATEAUX, EUROPE MEDIA, PAGE(S) 192-193,206-212, (1993), XP002059289 |