EP0962847 - Method and equipment for controlling a pipe network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Automation Oy Tulppatie 1 00880 Helsinki / FI | [2003/35] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states Neles Controls OY PL 6 00881 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pyötsiä, Jouni Niittyranta 1 A 2 00930 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Kreivi, Mika Kontulankaari 2 F 161 00940 Helsinki / FI | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter, et al Ruska & Co. Oy, Runeberginkatu 5 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1999/49] | Ruska, Anja Marjatta, et al Ruska & Co Oy, Runeberginkatu 5 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 99660090.4 | 26.05.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | FI19980001231 | 01.06.1998 Original published format: FI 981231 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962847 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962847 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/06, F04B49/22, F04B49/20 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G05D7/0688 (EP,US);
F04B49/20 (EP,US);
F04B49/225 (EP,US);
F04B2205/173 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/33] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung eines Leitungsnetzes | [1999/49] | English: | Method and equipment for controlling a pipe network | [1999/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de régulation d'un réseau de conduites | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 10.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 17.09.2003 | IT | 17.09.2003 | ES | 28.12.2003 | GB | 26.05.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 17.09.2003 | |
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
GB | 26.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | ES | 28.12.2003 | |
GB | 26.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | ES | 28.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4204808 (CLAYTON HADWEN A [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS58113596 ; | [A]JPS5641476 ; | [A]JPH03172597 ; | [A] - I.H. GIBSON, "variable speed drives as flow control elements", ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL., INSTRUMENT SOCIETY OF AMERICA, RESEARCH TRIANGLE PARK., US, (1993), vol. 48, no. 3, ISSN 1054-0032, pages 1939 - 1942, XP000447995 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830930), vol. 7, no. 221, Database accession no. (M - 246), & JP58113596 A 19830706 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810624), vol. 5, no. 97, Database accession no. (M - 075), & JP56041476 A 19810418 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911022), vol. 15, no. 414, Database accession no. (M - 1171), & JP03172597 A 19910725 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - H.-J. DORN, E. ENGELTER, "drehzahlveränderbare Pumpenantriebe: eine Alternative zu Stellventilen?", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS - ATP., OLDENBOURG VERLAG. MUNCHEN., DE, (1987), vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0178-2320, pages 259 - 262, XP002114953 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * |