EP0938947 - Suction device for fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deutschenbaur, Paul Dianastr. 10 82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
Golubovic, Goran Albert-Rosshaupter-Str. 94 81369 München / DE | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 99810122.4 | 12.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | DE19981007812 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19807812 | [1999/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938947 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938947 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
B23B49/026 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2000/19] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Absaugen von flüssigen Medien | [1999/35] | English: | Suction device for fluids | [1999/35] | French: | Dispositif pour aspirer des fluides | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB328246 (CHARLES SGONINA) [A] 1 * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 18; figure 2 *; | [A]US3033298 (JOHNSON BERT E) [A] 9* figure 2 *; | [A]FR2324401 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 5-9 *; | [DA]DE8813719U (DTH DIAMANT-TECHNIK-HERDECKE GMBH) [DA] 1 * figure 3; claim - * |