EP1045166 - Fluid spring adjustable in length [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cabex AG Am Schrägen Weg 14 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kulhavy, Sava V. Oberstrasse 127 9000 St.Gallen / CH | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Kulhavy, Sava, et al MOETTELI & Associés SARL St. Leonhardstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Kulhavy, Sava, et al MOETTELI & Associés SARL St. Leonhardstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | ||
Former [2000/42] | Kulhavy, Sava, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Sava V. Kulhavy, Kornhausstrasse 3, Postfach 1138 9001 St. Gallen / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810316.2 | 16.04.1999 | [2000/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045166 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/02 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
F16F9/0263 (EP);
F16F9/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/28] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, LI | ||
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Längenverstellbare Fluidfeder | [2000/42] | English: | Fluid spring adjustable in length | [2000/42] | French: | Ressort à fluide réglable en longeur | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 19.04.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19501301 (SUSPA COMPART AG) [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [A]EP0554578 (HOLLAND HELLAS HOLDING B V) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0353549 (BAUER FRITZ & SOEHNE OHG); | [A]DE7434101U (STABILUS) |