EP1047236 - Synchronisation in a data transmission system with Fast Fourier Transformation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dzung, Dacfey, Dr. Albisstrasse 1 5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
Müller, Markus A., Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 39 8057 Zürich / CH | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2000/43] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Business Services Ltd, Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810338.6 | 22.04.1999 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047236 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L7/04 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
H04L27/2607 (EP);
H04L27/2662 (EP);
H04L27/2675 (EP);
H04L7/042 (EP);
H04L7/041 (EP);
H04L7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/29] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Synchronisation in einem Datenübertragungssystem mittels Fast Fourier Transformation | [2000/43] | English: | Synchronisation in a data transmission system with Fast Fourier Transformation | [2000/43] | French: | Ynchronisation dans un système de transmission de données avec transformation rapide de Fourier | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/12] | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9834368 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 17 - line 26 * * page 5, line 17 - page 8, line 2; figures 2A,3 *; | [X]EP0730357 (TELIA AB [SE]) [X] 1,8,9 * page 3, line 8 - line 38 * * page 4, line 40 - page 6, line 30; figures 4,5,8 *; | [XA]WO9503656 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 16 - line 32 * * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 13 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 2; figure 2 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 3; figure 3 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 9 * [A] 7-9; | [E]EP0915597 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 16 - page 4, paragraph 26 * * page 5, paragraph 35 - paragraph 37; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0689313 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,7-9 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 20 * * column 7, line 1 - line 12; figure 4 * * column 8, line 17 - column 10, line 32; figures 6,7 * * column 11, line 7 - line 50; figure 10 * * column 12, line 19 - column 13, line 49; figures 11,12 *; | [A] - KELLER T ET AL, "ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEX SYNCHRONISATION TECHNIQUES FOR WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORKS", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, (19961015), XP002063294 [A] 1-9 * page 963, column R, paragraph 2 - page 967, column L, paragraph 1; figures 2,4,7 * | [A] - STANTCHEV B ET AL, "Burst synchronization for OFDM-based cellular systems with separate signaling channel", IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,XX,XX, (1998), page 758-762, XP002089525 [A] 2,3,7-9 * page 759, column L, paragraph 6 - column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 760, column L, paragraph 2 - page 761, column R, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | - JOHN G. PROAKIS, Digital Communications, 3rd edition, MCGRAW HILL, (1995), page 745 | - A.V. OPPENHEIM, R.W. SCHAFER, Discrete-Time Signal Processing, ENGLEWOOD CLIFFS N.J., PRENTICE HALL, (1989), pages 548 - 560 | - JOHN G. PROAKIS, digital communications, 3rd edition, MCGRAW HILL, (1995), pages 274 - 275 |