EP1069670 - Hybrid electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Industrielle de Sonceboz S.A. 5, rue Rosselet-Challandes 2605 Sonceboz / CH | [2001/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urwyler, Jean-François 36, rue de Bruye 2732 Reconviller / CH | 02 /
Oudet, Claude 12, rue Capitaine Arrachart 25000 Besançon / FR | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Reuteler, Raymond Werner Novagraaf Switzerland S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle SA Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets/Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Reuteler, Raymond Werner WILLIAM BLANC & CIE, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle SA, 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets/Genève / CH | ||
Former [2001/03] | WILLIAM BLANC & CIE Conseils en Propriété Industrielle SA, Rue du Valais 9 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810614.0 | 12.07.1999 | [2001/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069670 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K37/18 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
H02K37/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/40] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hybrid-Elektromotor | [2001/03] | English: | Hybrid electric motor | [2001/03] | French: | Moteur électrique hybride | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 18.07.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0288050 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 19 - line 29; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0581612 (MINEBEA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* page 2, line 16 - line 29; figures 9A,9B,10 * |