EP0986275 - Method for purchasing goods or services with a mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swisscom AG Alte Tiefenaustrasse 6 Worblaufen/Ittigen 3050 Bern / CH | [2009/31] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Swisscom Mobile AG Schwarztorstrasse 61 3050 Bern / CH | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Swisscom AG Alte Tiefenaustrasse 6 3050 Bern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stadelmann, Anton Niklaus Bodenacker 69 3065 Bolligen / CH | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810644.7 | 16.07.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | CH19980001852 | 10.09.1998 Original published format: CH 185298 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986275 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986275 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, G07F7/10, G07F7/08 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3223 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3255 (EP,US);
G07F7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/11] | H04Q7/22, G07F7/10, G07F7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Extension states | RO | 24.06.2000 | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Kaufen von Waren oder Dienstleistungen mit einem Mobiltelefon | [2000/11] | English: | Method for purchasing goods or services with a mobile telephone | [2000/11] | French: | Procédé pour acheter des articles ou des services avec un téléphone mobile | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | IE | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | PT | 11.01.2010 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9411849 (VATANEN HARRI TAPANI [FI]) [A] 1-23* claim 7 *; | [XA]WO9613814 (VAZVAN BEHRUZ [FI]) [X] 1-3,5-13,16,18,22 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 11 * * page 7, line 1 - line 26 * [A] 14,15,17,23; | [X]WO9625828 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12,14-16,18,21 * page 13, line 3 - page 15, line 4 * * page 16, line 1 - page 17, line 11 * * page 17, line 24 - line 27 * * page 18, line 22 - page 19, line 28 *; | [X]WO9704609 (EII KONSULTER [SE], et al) [X] 1,5-13,16,18,19 * page 8, line 21 - line 31 * * page 11, line 8 - line 29 *; | [XA]WO9811519 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10-12 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 28 * [A] 2,8,9 |