EP0982457 - Running mechanism for a sliding door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKU AG Wilerstrasse 90 CH-8370 Sirnach / CH | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidhauser, Heinz Hauptstrasse 76 8588 Zihlschlacht / CH | 02 /
Zingg, Heinz In der Breitl 3 9244 Niederuzwil / CH | [2009/41] |
Former [2000/09] | 01 /
Schmidhauser, Heinz Hauptstrasse 76 8588 Zihlschlacht / CH | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Patentanwalt H.R. Gachnang Badstrasse 5 Postfach 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810647.0 | 19.07.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | CH19980001720 | 21.08.1998 Original published format: CH 172098 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982457 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982457 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982457 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/06 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
E05D15/063 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/64 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/528 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | Laufwerks-Anordnung für eine Schiebetür | [2000/09] | English: | Running mechanism for a sliding door | [2000/09] | French: | Mécanisme de roulement pour porte coulissante | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | IE | 07.10.2009 | IT | 07.10.2009 | NL | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | [2012/37] |
Former [2011/28] | DK | 07.10.2009 | |
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | DK | 07.10.2009 | |
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | DK | 07.10.2009 | |
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 18.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4945605 (HAAB KARL [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * column 2, line 35 - line 57; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0818598 (HAWA AG [CH]) [A] 1* column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 9; figures 2-7 * |