EP1085711 - Method and apparatus for processing and forwarding data packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tschudin, Christian, Prof. Dr. Delsbergerallee 61 4053 Basel / CH | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Zbinden, Paul A. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Zbinden, Paul A. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2001/12] | Zbinden, Paul A. Patentanwaltsbüro Eder AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810833.6 | 20.09.1999 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085711 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085711 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/70 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/566 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/12] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung und Weiterleitung von Datenpaketen | [2001/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for processing and forwarding data packets | [2001/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de traitement et d' acheminement des paquets de données | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2004 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.2013 | BE | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | IT | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | GB | 20.09.2013 | IE | 20.09.2013 | LU | 20.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 20.09.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 20.09.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 20.09.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
ES | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4679189 (OLSON JEFFREY J [US], et al) [A] 1,5-15 * abstract ** column 15, line 3 - line 40 *; | [XA] - BANCHS A., EFFELSBERG W., TSCHUDIN C., TURAU V., "Multicasting Multimedia Streams with Active Networks", 23RD ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS LCN'98, Lowell, Massachutetts, (19981011), pages 150 - 159, XP000884232 [X] 1,5-15 * page 151, column L, paragraph 2.1 - page 152, column L, paragraph 2.1.4 * [A] 2-4 | [XA] - SMITH J M ET AL, "ACTIVATING NETWORKS: A PROGRESS REPORT", COMPUTER,US,IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LONG BEACH., CA, US, (199904), vol. 32, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 32 - 41, XP000824989 [X] 1,5-15 * page 32, column L, line 1 - page 36, column R, line 20 * * page 40, column R, line 1 - line 52 * [A] 2-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.755003 |