EP1092386 - Method and device for determining the concentration of a substance in blood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Süsstrunk Anita Kleeweidstrasse 102 8041 Zürich / CH | [2001/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Süsstrunk, Heinz Kleeweidstrasse 102 8041 Zürich / CH | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810933.4 | 13.10.1999 | [2001/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092386 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/05 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/05 (EP);
A61B5/14532 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/02] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung einer Stoffkonzentration im Blut | [2001/16] | English: | Method and device for determining the concentration of a substance in blood | [2001/16] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détermination de la concentration d'une substance dans le sang | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/39] | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.12.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.12.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9504496 (SOLID STATE FARMS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9,12,14,19 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 27 * * page 8, line 20 - line 33 * * page 16, line 10 - line 22 * * page 17, line 33 - page 18, line 3 *; | [A]US4690149 (KO HARVEY W [US]) [A] 1,14,18 * column 5, line 3 - line 57 * * column 7, line 24 - line 41 *; | [A]US5119819 (THOMAS GRAHAM H [US], et al) [A] 1,7,14 * column 6, line 30 - line 51 * | [XA] - TENHUNEN J ET AL, "Non-invasive glucose measurement based on selective near infrared absorption; requirements on instrumentation and spectral range", MEASUREMENT,GB,INSTITUTE OF MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL. LONDON, (19981001), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 0263-2241, pages 173 - 177, XP004143575 [X] 1,2,10,12 * sections "Introduction", "Measurement stup", "Verification of the system with water glucose solution", "Non-invasive measurements" and "Data processing and results" * [A] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0263-2241(98)00054-2 |