EP1069063 - Pin action timing adjustment device in a folding cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD. 26-24, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD. 26-24, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibuya, Kazuaki 1700-20, Kamihirama, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Tomonari 936-4 Shinmarukohigashi, 3-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Seiji 8-10 Heiancho, 2-chome, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 8035 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810941.7 | 15.10.1999 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | JP19990202202 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20220299 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1069063 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1069063 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069063 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/16 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
B65H45/168 (EP,US);
B65H45/28 (EP,US);
B65H2301/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/42] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Einstellung der zeitlichen Steuerung der Punkturnadeln in einem Falzzylinder | [2001/03] | English: | Pin action timing adjustment device in a folding cylinder | [2001/03] | French: | Dispositif de réglage du temps d'actionnement des aiguilles de perforation dans un cylindre de pliage | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 18.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.2004 | CH | 21.04.2004 | FR | 21.04.2004 | IT | 21.04.2004 | LI | 21.04.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FR | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
LI | 21.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0335190 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 25 - line 44 * * column 6, line 4 - line 22 * * column 6, line 34 - line 48; figure - *; | [XY]DE4117205 (FRANKENTHAL AG ALBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 36 * * column 7, line 8 - line 23 * * column 8, line 38 - line 42; figures 1,9 * [Y] 4,5; | [A]DE4316352 (ZIRKON DRUCKMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [YA]DE4408202 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 3; figure . * [A] 1-3; | [A]EP0741104 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,7* column 2, line 6 - line 8; figures 5,8; claim 1 * |