EP1013294 - Diagonal flux pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Levitronix LLC 85 First Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2002/15] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Sulzer Electronics AG Hegifeldstrasse 30 8409 Winterthur / CH | ||
For all designated states LUST ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GmbH Gewerbestrasse 5-9 35633 Lahnau-Waldgirmes / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöb, Reto, Dr. Ackerstrasse 75E 8604 Volketswil / CH | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2002/15] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2000/26] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 99811060.5 | 17.11.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | EP19980811236 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98811236 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013294 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013294 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, H02K7/09 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H02K7/14 (EP,US);
A61M60/178 (EP,US);
A61M60/237 (EP,US);
A61M60/419 (EP,US);
A61M60/806 (EP,US);
A61M60/82 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Diagonalflusspumpe | [2000/26] | English: | Diagonal flux pump | [2000/26] | French: | Pompe à flux diagonal | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 29.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0425257 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]WO9320860 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]); | [Y]WO9742414 (UNIV UTAH [US]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19626224 (RAU GUENTER PROF DR [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9811650 (SULZER ELECTRONICS AG [CH], et al) [A] 6 * abstract * | Examination | EP0810374 |