EP1049248 - "Constant duty-cycle limiting of analog input signal swing in a class-D amplifier" [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masini, Marco Via L. Della Pila, 5 20162 Milano / IT | 02 /
Tavazzani, Claudio Via R. Pampuri, 2 27020 Trivolzio / IT | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A., Piazza Repubblica 5 21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830248.3 | 27.04.1999 | [2000/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049248 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1049248 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/217, H03G11/00, H03G11/04 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
H03G11/002 (EP,US);
H03F3/217 (EP,US);
H03G11/04 (EP,US);
H03F2200/351 (EP,US);
H03F2200/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/29] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Begrenzer für den analogen Eingangssignalhub in einem Klasse-D-Verstärker bei gleichbleibendem Tastverhältnis | [2000/44] | English: | "Constant duty-cycle limiting of analog input signal swing in a class-D amplifier" | [2000/44] | French: | Limiteur à rapport cyclique constant pour l'amplitude d'un signal analogique d'entrée dans un amplificateur classe D | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 03.05.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0184280 (BOSE CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 23, line 9 - line 32; figures 11-13,19 *; | [A]EP0335317 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 2,3 * column 4, line 17 - line 51; figure 4 *; | [A]US5525922 (MASARIK DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 7; figure 2 * | [A] - EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS US, (198405), vol. 29, no. 10, page 213, XP002116288 [A] 2,3 * the whole document * |