EP1048608 - Continuous method and apparatus for the sterilization of bottled drinks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simonazzi S.p.A. Via La Spezia 241/A 43040 Parma / IT | [2006/44] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states SIG SIMONAZZI S.P.A. Via La Spezia, 241/A 43040 Parma / IT | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Sasib Beverage Machinery M.S. S.p.A. Via F.lli Canvelli, 22 43015 Noceto (Parma) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zacche, Vanni c/o Sasib Beverage MS. Spa., Via F.lli Canvelli 22 43015 Noceto-Parma / IT | 02 /
Preti, Fabrizio c/o Sasib Beverage MS. Spa., Via F.lli Canvelli 22 43015 Noceto-Parma / IT | 03 /
Colato, Luca c/o Sasib Beverage MS. Spa., Via F.lli Canvelli 22 43015 Noceto-Parma / IT | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Perani Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830254.1 | 29.04.1999 | [2000/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048608 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1048608 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B67C7/00, A61L2/02 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
B67C7/0073 (EP);
A61L2/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | ||
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 27.04.2001 | LT | 27.04.2001 | LV | 27.04.2001 | MK | 27.04.2001 | RO | 27.04.2001 | SI | 27.04.2001 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Sterilisation von in Flaschen abgefüllten Getränken | [2000/44] | English: | Continuous method and apparatus for the sterilization of bottled drinks | [2000/44] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour la stérilisation en continu de boissons en bouteilles | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2002 | 30.04.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2005 | 30.04.2007 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.10.2007 | BE | 03.10.2007 | CH | 03.10.2007 | DK | 03.10.2007 | FI | 03.10.2007 | LI | 03.10.2007 | NL | 03.10.2007 | SE | 03.01.2008 | GR | 04.01.2008 | IE | 29.04.2008 | LU | 29.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/19] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CH | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
LI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
IE | 29.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CH | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
LI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
IE | 29.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CH | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
LI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CH | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
LI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CH | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
LI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
CH | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
LI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
CH | 03.10.2007 | ||
LI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 03.10.2007 | |
LI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4126136 (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,14 * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 5; figure 1 * [Y] 15,16; | [A]DE4242311 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO9508275 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 15 * page 7, line 11 - line 16 *; | [A]DE19612322 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]); | [YA]WO9848856 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US]) [Y] 15,16 * page 1, line 15 - line 27 * * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 29 * [A] 1 |