EP1094184 - A hinge for motor-vehicle doors, in particular for a hatchback [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gammastamp S.p.A. Via Avogadro 19 10121 Torino / IT | [2001/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Audisio, Vittorio c/o Gammastamp Spa, Via Nova, 34/36/38 13041 Bianzé, Vercelli / IT | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2001/17] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Corso Fiume 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830665.8 | 22.10.1999 | [2001/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094184 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094184 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
E05D7/0423 (EP);
E05D5/062 (EP);
E05D7/043 (EP);
E05Y2900/531 (EP);
E05Y2900/546 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/50] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Scharnier für KFZ-Türe, insbesondere für eine Heckklappe | [2001/17] | English: | A hinge for motor-vehicle doors, in particular for a hatchback | [2001/17] | French: | Charnière pour portes de véhicules, en particulier pour un hayon arrière | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4034599 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 26 - line 55 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 6; figure 4 *; | [Y]DE9310072U (RODENBECK FRIEDHELM) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 2 - line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3423037 (AUDI NSU AUTO UNION AG) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [A]DE4101363 (MUNCH) [A] 1 * column 6, line 24 - line 52 * * column 7, line 6 - line 28; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE3229732 (AUDI NSU AUTO UNION) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * |