EP0959591 - ATM switching module suited for system expansion without cell-loss [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Toshiharu, NEC Comm. Syst. Kyushu, Ltd. 2-4-1, Momochihama, Sawara-ku Fukuoka, Fukuoka / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Tetsuro, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Swenson, Raymond c/o RAYMOND SWENSON PATENTBYRA AB Sankt Eriksterrassen 72A 112 34 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Swenson, Raymond c/o RAYMOND SWENSON PATENTBYRA AB Sankt Eriksterrassen 72A 112 34 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99850088.8 | 20.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | JP19980139046 | 20.05.1998 Original published format: JP 13904698 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959591 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
H04L49/506 (EP,US);
H04L49/1553 (EP,US);
H04L49/255 (EP,US);
H04L49/3081 (EP,US);
H04L49/45 (EP,US);
H04L49/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | ES, SE [2000/31] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ATM-Koppelfeldmodul zur Systemerweiterung ohne Zellenverlust | [1999/47] | English: | ATM switching module suited for system expansion without cell-loss | [1999/47] | French: | Module de commutation ATM adaptée pour expansion sans perte de cellules | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0785698 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 2,7 * page 4, line 2 - line 8 * * page 10, line 45 - line 46 * * page 10, line 50 - line 51 *; | [A]WO9530318 (NEWBRIDGE NETWORKS CORP [CA], et al) [A] 3 * page 10, line 5 - line 30 * * page 2, line 16 - line 21 * | [X] - FISCHER W ET AL, "A SCALABLE ATM SWITCHING SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (19911001), vol. 9, no. 8, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 1299 - 1307, XP000267581 [X] 1-7 * page 1300, column L, line 21 - line 24 * * page 1300, column L, line 34 - column R, line 33 * * page 1301, column L, line 30 - line 57 * * page 1303, column R, line 44 - page 1304, column L, line 13 * * page 1304, column R, line 44 - line 56 * * page 1304, column R, line 7 - line 23 * * page 1305, column L, line 52 - column R, line 37 * * page 1305, column R, line 51 - page 1306, column L, line 35 * * figures 2,6,7,9,10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.105176 |