EP1039433 - A marking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Distribution Centre AB Box 1009 611 29 Nyköping / SE | [2008/09] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Eljo AB 269 81 Bastad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magnusson, Anders Olsbränningen 11 310 41 Gullbrandstorp / SE | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2007/18] | Stanley-Madsen, Ib Schneider Electric Danmark A/S Patent Department Industriparken 32 2750 Ballerup / DK | ||
Former [2003/09] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Eljo AB 269 81 Bastad / SE | ||
Former [2000/39] | Larsson, Sten ITT FLYGT AB Box 1309 171 25 Solna / SE | Application number, filing date | 99850183.7 | 29.11.1999 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | SE19990000993 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: SE 9900993 | [2000/39] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039433 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039433 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039433 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/20, G09F7/18, G09F3/06, H02G3/14, H01H9/18 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
H02G3/00 (EP);
H02G3/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | G09F3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | Markierungsvorrichtung | [2000/39] | English: | A marking device | [2000/39] | French: | Dispositif de marquage | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 19.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Request for further processing for: | 29.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | BE | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | IT | 26.03.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | LU | 29.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | SE | 30.11.2008 | IE | 01.12.2008 | [2010/31] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
LU | 29.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IE | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IE | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8504260U (GIRA, ELEKTROTECHNISCHE INDUSTRIE) [A] 1,2,4 * page 5, line 21 - line 33 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]DE3536005 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 4 - line 53 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]FR2629256 (BACO SA CONST ELECTR [FR]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 26 - line 36 * * page 4, line 1 - line 30 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2220188 (MAUGER ROY ALAN) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [X]DE4013803 (JUNG GMBH ALBRECHT [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * |