EP1022105 - Article consisting of a foam core and a covering layer and process of manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gonsette, Bernard Vallée des Pommiers 49 6110 Montigny-le-Tilleul / BE | For all designated states Vanhamme, Eric Rue de Marcinelle 162 6032 Mont-sur-Marchienne / BE | [2000/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 99870011.6 | 22.01.1999 | [2000/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022105 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/12, B29C44/56, // C08J9/34 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
B29C44/1266 (EP);
B29C33/123 (EP);
B29C44/1285 (EP);
B29C45/14795 (EP);
C08J9/34 (EP);
B29C2045/14877 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/14] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aus einem Schaumkern und einer Deckschicht bestehender Gegenstand und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2000/30] | English: | Article consisting of a foam core and a covering layer and process of manufacturing same | [2000/30] | French: | Article à noyau mousseux et avec une couche de couverture et son procédé de fabrication | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 27.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/05] | 26.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3954926 (PAHL FRITZ WILHELM ET AL) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 10 * * column 11, line 3 - line 21 *; | [X]EP0738576 (DAVIDSON TEXTRON INC) [X] 1,4,7 * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 13; figure 1 * * column 8, line 13 - column 9, line 21; figures 7-9 *; | [X]WO8403251 (BARUP PTY LTD) [X] 1,4,7 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [DA]US5300264 (WOLFRUM CHRISTIAN ET AL) [DA] 1-8 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 38; claim 5 *; | [A]US4446185 (WARAGAI KENICHI ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 10 - line 54; figures 16-19 *; | [A]US4793793 (SWENSON ET AL) [A] 1,4,7 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4436276 (DONAHUE GORDON J) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 61 - line 68 *; | [A]GB990786 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * page 2, line 89 - line 118; figure -; claim 4 * |