EP1048715 - Method of dispensing a detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vega, Jose Luis Bloemendallaan 47 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 02 /
Tcheou, Eric (NMN) Boulevard Louis Schmidt 43 1040 Brussel / BE | 03 /
Busch, Alfred (NMN) Handelsstraat 210 1840 Londerzeel / BE | 04 /
Baeck, André Cesar Putsesteenweg 273 2820 Bonheiden / BE | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 99870084.3 | 30.04.1999 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048715 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/12, C11D17/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
C11D3/001 (EP);
C11D17/0073 (EP);
C11D3/126 (EP);
C11D3/39 (EP);
C11D3/3932 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/29] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Spenden einer Waschmittelzusammensetzung | [2000/44] | English: | Method of dispensing a detergent composition | [2000/44] | French: | Procédé de distribution d'une composition détergente | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/09] | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0598586 (UNILEVER PLC) [X] 1-3,7,11 * page 8, line 36 - page 9, line 16 * * page 17, line 35 - line 37 * [A] 5,12 [Y] 1-4,6,7; | [DYA]EP0466484 (UNILEVER PLC) [DY] 1-4,6,7 * page 2, line 50 - line 57 * * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 25 - line 34 * * page 6, line 20 - line 22 * * claim 1 * [A] 5,8-12; | [X]GB2320255 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-3,8 * claims 1,13,14 * * page 50, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 53, paragraph 1 - page 55, paragraph 1 *; | [X]GB2303142 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-3,8,11 * claims 1,12 * * page 37, paragraph 2 * * page 39 - page 40 * * page 32, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *; | [A]EP0866118 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1,6,8,12 * page 15, line 15 - page 17, line 4 *; | [DA]JPH0987696 ; | [A]DE4404279 (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1,6,7,11,12 * column 4, line 67 - column 12, line 25 * * example 5; claims 1,9-13 *; | [A]EP0255779 (UNILEVER PLC) [A] 1 * claims 1-3,5 *; | [E]WO9940171 (UNILEVER PLC) [E] 1-7 * page 3, line 12 - page 6, line 2 * * page 12, line 11 - page 15, line 20 * * page 21, line 5 - page 22, line 24 * * claim - * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 199, no. 707, & JP09087696 A 19970331 (LION CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract * |