EP1064973 - Document with scratch-off layer precluding fraudulent reading [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANQUE NATIONALE DE BELGIQUE S.A. 14, boulevard de Berlaimont B-1000 Bruxelles / BE | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salade, Marc Rue de la Petite Escavée, 11 1490 Court-Saint-Etienne / BE | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [2001/01] | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick S.A., 32, Avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 99870136.1 | 01.07.1999 | [2001/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064973 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064973 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/06, B42D15/00 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
A63F3/0665 (EP);
A63F3/0655 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | Dokument mit abkratzbarer, betrügerisches Lesen verhindernder Schicht | [2001/01] | English: | Document with scratch-off layer precluding fraudulent reading | [2001/01] | French: | Document à couche grattable empêchant la lecture frauduleuse | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2004 | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | IE | 14.01.2004 | IT | 14.01.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CY | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2188283 (ADVERTISING AND MARKETING ASSO) [A] 1,11 * claims 1,3,4,6-9 *; | [A]US5037101 (MCNULTY JAMES P [US]) [A] 9* column W *; | [X]US5193854 (BOROWSKI JR JOSEPH C [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10-14,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5282651 (ALONSO FRANK [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9720699 (DITTLER BROTHERS INC [US]) [X] 1,11 * page 10, line 5 - line 6; claims 1,11 *; | [A]US5863075 (RICH BENNY R [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,8,11,14 * column 5, line 13 - line 56 * * claims 1,13,14 * | Examination | WO0005080 | by applicant | FR2595987 | WO9514579 | WO9640394 |