EP1081632 - Biometric authentication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keyware Technologies Kemmelweg 46 8900 Ieper / BE | [2001/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEYWARE TECHNOLOGIES, c/o Declercq Francis Exelsiorlaan 28-30 B-1930 Zaventem / BE | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7 1060 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 99870178.3 | 01.09.1999 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081632 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/68 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G06V40/10 (EP,US);
G06F18/256 (EP);
G06V10/811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/48] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Biometrisches Gerät zur Bescheinigung der Echtheit | [2001/10] | English: | Biometric authentication device | [2001/10] | French: | Appareil biométrique d'authentification | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.10.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2634570 (REITTER RENAUD [FR], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]GB2229305 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]WO9526013 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A] - LUO R C ET AL, "A TUTORIAL ON MULTISENSOR INTEGRATION AND FUSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS SOCIETY. (IECON),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1990), vol. CONF. 16, ISBN 0-87942-600-4, pages 707 - 722, XP000217315 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1990.149228 |