EP0962277 - Plasma welding torch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inocon Technologie Gesellschaft m.b.H Wiener Strasse 3 4800 Attnang-Puchheim / AT | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwankhart, Gerhard Dipl.-Ing. Tuffeltsham 68 4800 Attnang-Puchheim / AT | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Gonzagagasse 15/2 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2003/18] | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1999/49] | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8/3/8 1010 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 99890167.2 | 25.05.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | AT19980000941 | 02.06.1998 Original published format: AT 94198 | AT19990000002U | 04.01.1999 Original published format: AT 299 U | [1999/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962277 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962277 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23K10/02 | [1999/49] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/33] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plasma-Schweissbrenner | [1999/49] | English: | Plasma welding torch | [1999/49] | French: | Torche de soudage à plasma | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 09.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.01.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02258177 ; | [A]CH605011 (CASTOLIN SA) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 20 - line 60; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910108), vol. 015, no. 006, Database accession no. (M - 1066), & JP02258177 A 19901018 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |