EP0965551 - Apparatus for folding printed or paper products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rota-Schneider Produktions-Aktiengesellschaft Wiener Strasse 118 2483 Ebreichsdorf / AT | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirthwein, Erich Florianigasse 58 1080 Wien / AT | 02 /
Petto, Franz Giessaufgasse 28 1050 Wien / AT | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/51] | Weiser, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schütz u.Partner, Schottenring 16, Börsegebäude 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 99890193.8 | 16.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | AT19980001034 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: AT 103498 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965551 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965551 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/22 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
B65H45/22 (EP);
B65H2301/33212 (EP);
B65H2301/4422 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Falzen von Druck- oder Papierprodukten | [1999/51] | English: | Apparatus for folding printed or paper products | [1999/51] | French: | Appareil pour plier des produits imprimés ou des produits en papier | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE571796 (GEBRÜDER BREHMER) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4747817 (NEWSOME) [DA] 1,4,7,8 * column W *; | [A]DE2232169 (LONGFORD EQUIP INTERNATIONAL LTD.) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 4-7 * |