EP0974723 - Lock with several bolts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTO FRANK EISENWARENFABRIK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Lapp-Finze-Strasse 21 8401 Kalsdorf bei Graz / AT | [2000/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hülble-Königsberger, Wolfgang Raabau 73 8330 Feldbach / AT | 02 /
Riznik, Peter Jössnerstrasse 19 8430 Tillmitsch / AT | 03 /
Hötzl, Manfred Kauperzgasse 28 8055 Graz / AT | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Müllner, Erwin, et al Patentanwälte Müllner, Katschinka, Müllner Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 99890246.4 | 22.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | AT19980001272 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: AT 127298 | AT19980001769 | 21.10.1998 Original published format: AT 176998 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0974723 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0974723 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974723 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/12, E05C9/02 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
E05C9/021 (EP);
E05C9/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/04] | E05C9/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/33] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrriegelschloss | [2000/04] | English: | Lock with several bolts | [2000/04] | French: | Serrure à plusieurs pênes | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 18.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4962653 (KAUP LUDGER) [A] 1,3,4 * column 9, line 22 - column 10, line 41; figure - *; | [A]US4227723 (ROSELL JEAN) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 53 - column 2, line 61; figure - *; | [A]FR2469537 (GILRO) [A] 1,2 * figure - * |