EP1045775 - SELFSUPPORTING ASSEMBLY WITHOUT A HEAVEY LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/43] | ULTRALIGHT, SOUND AND SHOCK ABSORBING COMPONENT SET | ||
[2002/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIETER AUTOMOTIVE (INTERNATIONAL) AG Seestrasse 15 8702 Zollikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states RIETER AUTOMOTIVE (INTERNATIONAL) AG Seestrasse 15 CH-8702 Zollikon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTS, Thorsten Pestalozzistrasse 42 D-64401 Gross-Bieberau / DE | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/27] | Graf, Seifert & Partner Intellectual Property Industrieplatz 3 Postfach 1179 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2002/16] | Graf, Werner, et al Graf Seifert & Partner, Postfach 1179 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2000/43] | Ritscher, Thomas, Dr., et al RITSCHER & SEIFERT Patentanwälte Forchstrasse 452 Postfach 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99900006.0 | 06.01.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999CH00005 | Priority number, date | CH19980000034 | 09.01.1998 Original published format: CH 3498 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935007 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045775 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045775 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02, B60R13/08, G10K11/172 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G10K11/172 (EP,US);
B32B3/20 (EP,US);
B60R13/02 (EP,US);
B60R13/08 (EP,US);
B60R13/0815 (EP,US);
B60R13/0838 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1234 (EP,US);
Y10T428/236 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | SCHWERSCHICHTFREIES UND SELBSTTRAGENDES MONTAGEPAKET | [2002/03] | English: | SELFSUPPORTING ASSEMBLY WITHOUT A HEAVEY LAYER | [2002/03] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE AUTOPORTEUR SANS COUCHE LOURDE | [2002/03] |
Former [2000/43] | ULTRALEICHTER, SCHALL- UND SCHOCKABSORBIERENDER BAUSATZ | ||
Former [2000/43] | ULTRALIGHT, SOUND AND SHOCK ABSORBING COMPONENT SET | ||
Former [2000/43] | JEU DE PIECES ULTRALEGERES A ABSORPTION DES BRUITS ET DES CHOCS | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS61249853 ; | [X]EP0352993 (SHORT BROTHERS PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * pages 1-5 *; | [A]WO9212855 (SHORT BROTHERS PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2727189 (PERIPHERIE [FR]) [A] 4 * figure 2 *; | [X]DE19627106 (HP CHEMIE PELZER RES & DEV [IE]) [X] 1,3,5,8,10,16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0787578 (GREINER & SOEHNE C A [AT]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE29607262U (ROTHE MANFRED PLASTIFOL KG [DE]) [A] 4* figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870331), vol. 11, no. 102, Database accession no. (M - 576)<2549>, & JP61249853 A 19861107 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.) [X] 1,5,16,17 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0334179 |