EP1000408 - COMPUTER TOMAGRAPHY METHOD WITH HELICAL SCANNING OF AN EXAMINATION AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/20] | COMPUTER TOMAGRAPHY METHOD WITH HELICOIDAL SCANNING OF AN EXAMINATION AREA | ||
[2002/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIELSSON, Per-Erik Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2003/05] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Hartmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99900068.0 | 12.01.1999 | [2000/20] | WO1999IB00027 | Priority number, date | WO1998SE00029 | 13.01.1998 Original published format: PCT/SE98/00029 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936885 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000408 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000408 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
G06T11/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/20] | Title | German: | COMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIE-VERFAHREN MIT HELIXFÖRMIGER ABTASTUNG EINES UNTERSUCHUNGSBEREICHS | [2000/20] | English: | COMPUTER TOMAGRAPHY METHOD WITH HELICAL SCANNING OF AN EXAMINATION AREA | [2002/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE TOMOGRAPHIE AVEC BALAYAGE HELICOIDAL D'UNE ZONE D'EXAMEN | [2002/15] |
Former [2000/20] | COMPUTER TOMAGRAPHY METHOD WITH HELICOIDAL SCANNING OF AN EXAMINATION AREA | ||
Former [2000/20] | PROCEDE DE COMPUTOTOMOGRAPHIE AVEC BALAYAGE HELICOIDAL D'UNE ZONE D'EXAMEN | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 07.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0773042 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 11, line 20 - line 31 *; | [PX]WO9830980 (EDHOLM PAUL [SE], et al) [PX] 1-7 * abstract * * page 10, line 20 - page 14, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A] - WU C ET AL, "ANALYTIC RECONSTRUCTION FOR HELICAL-ORBIT CONE-BEAM SPECT", RECORD OF THE NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM AND MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERE, SAN FRANCISCO, OCT. 30 - NOV. 6, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19931030), vol. 3, pages 1510 - 1514, XP000462618 [A] 1,6 * page 1511, column L, paragraph B - column R, paragraph C * | [A] - KUDO H ET AL, "Feasible cone beam scanning methods for exact reconstruction in three-dimensional tomography", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA A (OPTICS AND IMAGE SCIENCE), DEC. 1990, USA, ISSN 0740-3232, vol. 7, no. 12, pages 2169 - 2183, XP002102879 | [A] - KUDO H ET AL, "Cone-beam filtered-backprojection algorithm for truncated helical data", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, OCT. 1998, IOP PUBLISHING, UK, ISSN 0031-9155, vol. 43, no. 10, pages 2885 - 2909, XP002102880 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/43/10/016 | Examination | US5257183 | US5390112 | - SCHALLER S. ET AL, "A new Approximate Algorithm for Image Reconstruction in Cone-Beam Spiral CT at Small Cone-Angles", IEEE NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM, ANAHEIM CA, (1996), pages 1703 - 1709 | - SCHALLER S. ET AL, "New, efficient Fourier-reconstruction method for approximate image reconstruction in spiral cone-beam CT at small cone angles", PROC. OF SPIE MED. IMAGING CONFERENCE, NEWPORT BEACH CA, (19970222), pages 213 - 224 | by applicant | DE19545778 |