EP1052694 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE HAVING INSULATING FILM OF FLUORINE-ADDED CARBON FILM AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states Tokyo Electron Limited 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKAHORI, Takashi 401, Bear Palace 37-5, Matsuki Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0362 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Akira 6-17-15, Akasakadai Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0144 / JP | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99900145.6 | 08.01.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999JP00034 | Priority number, date | JP19980014956 | 10.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1495698 | JP19980316857 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: JP 31685798 | [2000/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935684 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052694 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L21/314, H01L21/312 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/32051 (EP,US);
H01L21/768 (KR);
C23C16/26 (EP,US);
C23C16/30 (EP,US);
C23C16/56 (EP,US);
H01L21/0212 (EP,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,US);
H01L21/0234 (EP,US);
H01L21/02343 (EP,US);
H01L21/3127 (US);
H01L21/76814 (EP,US);
H01L21/76826 (EP,US);
H01L21/76828 (EP,US);
H01L21/76843 (EP,US);
H01L21/2855 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/46] | H01L21/768, H01L21/314 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/46] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERANORDNUNG MIT ISOLIERENDEM FILM AUF FLUORKOHLENSTOFFBASIS | [2000/46] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE HAVING INSULATING FILM OF FLUORINE-ADDED CARBON FILM AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS PRESENTANT UNE COUCHE ISOLANTE CONSTITUEE D'UN FILM DE CARBONE FLUORE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DUDIT DISPOSITIF | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2000 | Translation filed | 05.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP08003967.0 / EP1947685 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0795895 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,19 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9821748 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1,7,19* the whole document *; | [A] - CHIN-JONG CHAN ET AL, "Adhesion of copper to polytetrafluoroethylene polymer film with adhesive layers", MATERIALS SCIENCE OF HIGH TEMPERATURE POLYMERS FOR MICROELECTRONICS SYMPOSIUM MATER. RES. SOC PITTSBURGH, PA, USA, (1991), pages 363 - 368, XP008034857 [A] 1,7,19 * the whole document * | [A] - COSTA E ET AL, "Fluorocarbon and tungsten carbide multilayer coatings", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY ELSEVIER SWITZERLAND, (1997), vol. 97, no. 1-3, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 680 - 686, XP001202108 [A] 1,6,7,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(97)00332-0 | International search | [A]JPH08264648 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH09246242 (NEC CORP); | [AE]JPH10335461 (NEC CORP); | [AE]JPH1116918 (NEC CORP) |