EP0981414 - PROCESS AND PLANT FOR MANUFACTURING GRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVG Entwicklungs- u. Verwertungs- Gesellschaft m.b.H. Gustinus-Ambrosi-Strasse 1-3 8074 Raaba / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states EVG Entwicklungs- u. Verwertungs- Gesellschaft m.b.H. Gustinus-Ambrosi-Strasse 1-3 A-8074 Raaba / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RITTER, Klaus Peterstalstrasse 157 A-8042 Graz / AT | 02 /
RITTER, Gerhard Unterer Plattenweg 47 A-8043 Graz / AT | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Holzer, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Schütz u. Partner Brigittenauer Lände 50 1200 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Holzer, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schütz und Partner, Schottenring 16, Börsegebäude 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 99900389.0 | 08.01.1999 | [2000/09] | WO1999AT00005 | Priority number, date | AT19980000235 | 10.02.1998 Original published format: AT 23598 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9941029 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981414 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981414 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B21F27/10 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
B21F9/007 (EP);
B21F27/10 (EP);
B21F9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI [2000/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GITTERMATTEN | [2000/09] | English: | PROCESS AND PLANT FOR MANUFACTURING GRATES | [2000/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION DE MATS EN TREILLIS | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3326025 (TASABURO NISHIOKA) [A] 6,7,11* column 4, line 33 - line 43; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2214846 (ALLIED STEEL WIRE LTD [GB]) [A] 6,7 * figure -; claims 1,2,4,5,7,8,11,12 *; | [DY]EP0371956 (EVG ENTWICKLUNG VERWERT GES [AT]) [DY] 1-8,10 * column 4, line 48 - line 56 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 3; figure - *; | [Y]EP0780174 (INGEGNERIA IND S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 6 * * column 7, line 6 - line 46 * * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 9; figure -; claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0806257 (VMS HOLDING AG [CH]) [DA] 6,7 * the whole document * |