EP0966408 - GLASS COMPOSITIONS FOR MAKING GLAZING SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2001/20] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTHEREAU, Anne 108-110, rue Saint-Maur F-75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
BROWN-BRULANT, David 8 bis, boulevard Bretonnière F-21200 Baune / FR | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Renous Chan, Véronique Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Renous Chan, Véronique Saint-Gobain Recherche, 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 99900509.3 | 08.01.1999 | [1999/52] | WO1999FR00026 | Priority number, date | FR19980000176 | 09.01.1998 Original published format: FR 9800176 | FR19980002677 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9802677 | [1999/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935100 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966408 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/087, C03C4/02, C03C4/08 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
C03C3/091 (EP);
C03C3/087 (EP,KR);
C03C4/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, PT [1999/52] | Title | German: | GLASZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERGLASUNGEN | [1999/52] | English: | GLASS COMPOSITIONS FOR MAKING GLAZING SHEETS | [1999/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE VERRE DESTINEES A LA FABRICATION DE VITRAGES | [1999/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/25] | 28.01.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0536049 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9414716 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al) [DA] 1-10* the whole document *; | [DA]US5478783 (HIGBY PAIGE L [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0748776 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,8 * example 5; claim - *; | [A]WO9730948 (LIBBEY OWENS FORD CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0803479 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [PA]EP0831071 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [PA] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [PA]EP0834481 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,3-5,8 * example -; claim - *; | [PX]EP0854118 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,3-5,8 * example -; claim - * |