EP1081628 - PAYMENT SYSTEM AND ELECTRONIC PURSE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | For all designated states The Sakura Bank, Ltd. 3-1, Kudan Minami 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0074 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
For all designated states The Sakura Bank, Ltd. 3-1, Kudan Minami 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0074 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Nobuyuki, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
MORITA, Michihiro, The Sakura Bank, Limited 3-1, Kudan Minami 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0074 / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99900671.1 | 22.01.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999JP00282 | Priority number, date | JP19980062744 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6274498 | [2001/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946715 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081628 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/08, G06F19/00, G07F19/00 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G06Q20/425 (EP);
G06Q20/04 (EP);
G06Q20/3572 (EP);
G06Q20/363 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/10] | G06F19/00, G07F19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/10] | Title | German: | ZAHLUNGSSYSTEM UND ELEKTRONISCHE GELDBÖRSE | [2001/10] | English: | PAYMENT SYSTEM AND ELECTRONIC PURSE UNIT | [2001/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE PAIEMENT ET PORTEFEUILLE ELECTRONIQUE | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2000 | Translation filed | 11.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2739704 (BANQUE NATIONALE DE PARIS) [A] 1-6,9-15,18-23,27-35,40-43 * abstract *; | [A]US4736094 (S. YOSHIDA) [A] 1-6,8,10-15,17,19-23,26,28-35,40-43 * column A; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4851650 (S. KITADE); | [A]EP0640945 (AT & T); | [A]EP0717381 (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL) | International search | [Y]JPH09237298 ; | [Y]JPS59151259 ; | [Y]JPH05120306 ; | [A]JPS6332658 |