EP1058788 - HYDROSTATIC PUMP OR ENGINE WITH INFINITELY VARIABLE DEBIT OR IMPULSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baptista, Fernando Augusto R. Padua Correia, 30 P-4400 V.N. Gaia / PT | For all designated states Pereira Dias Baptista, Joao, Manuel Urbanizacao de Cortinha, 6-Cepaes 4740 Esposende / PT | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/50] | Application number, filing date | 99900727.1 | 15.01.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999PT00002 | Priority number, date | PT19980102121 | 23.02.1998 Original published format: PT 10212198 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942727 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058788 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058788 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/04 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
F04C14/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | ROTATIONSPUMPE MIT VARIABLEN FÖRDERMENGEN | [2000/50] | English: | HYDROSTATIC PUMP OR ENGINE WITH INFINITELY VARIABLE DEBIT OR IMPULSE | [2000/50] | French: | POMPE OU MOTEUR HYDROSTATIQUE A DEBIT OU IMPULSIONS POUVANT VARIER A L'INFINI | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 27.09.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2001 | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.07.2002 | SE | 31.10.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/05] | SE | 31.10.2002 | |
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 31.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB169836 (FREDERICK CHARLES THOMAS COLEB) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 97 - page 3, line 110; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE577016 (E H WILHELM KUEHN DR ING) [A] 1-8* page 2, line 24 - line 62; figure 1 *; | [X]GB846549 (CLIFFORD EDMUND BREWER) [X] 1,2,4-8 * page 2, line 102 - page 3, line 17; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE4014636 (LINDLMAIR THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |