EP1049766 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CELL LYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pasteur 2, Avenue du Pont Pasteur 69367 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Aventis Pasteur 2, Avenue pont Pasteur 69367 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVALIER, Michel 19, rue de la Guillotière F-38270 Beaurepaire / FR | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Ayroles, Marie-Pauline, et al Sanofi Pasteur Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69367 Lyon cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Ayroles, Marie-Pauline, et al 2, Avenue Pont Pasteur 69367 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99900963.2 | 20.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999FR00105 | Priority number, date | FR19980000815 | 21.01.1998 Original published format: FR 9800815 | [2000/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937750 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049766 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/06 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
C12N1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE FÜR ZELLYSE | [2000/45] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CELL LYSIS | [2000/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE LYSE CELLULAIRE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4294824 (JONES WILLIAM A ET AL) [A] 1,18 * column 4, line 29 - line 45; figure 2; claim - *; | [DA]WO9723601 (GENZYME CORP) [DA] 1,7,14 * example .; claim - *; | [A]US5096818 (DEBONVILLE DAVID A); | [A]DE4028771 (SOBOLEWSKI BERT); | [A]WO9602658 (MERCK & CO INC ;LEE ANN L (US); SAGAR SANGEETHA (US)) [A] 1,18 * figure 1 * |