EP1046122 - METHODS FOR MONITORING THE STATUS OF ASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosite Incorporated 11030 Roselle Street Suite D San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Biosite Incorporated 11030 Roselle Street, Suite D San Diego California 92121 / US | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Biosite Incorporated 11030 Roselle Street, Suite D San Diego California 92121 / US | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states BIOSITE DIAGNOSTICS INC. 11030 Roselle Street, Suite D San Diego California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUECHLER, Kenneth, F. 12523 Manifesto Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
ANDERBERG, Joseph, M. 470 Delage Court Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 03 /
MCPHERSON, Paul, H. 1449 Elva Court Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Harrison Goddard Foote Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | ||
Former [2000/43] | Moon, Donald Keith, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99901345.1 | 04.01.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999US00261 | Priority number, date | US19980003065 | 05.01.1998 Original published format: US 3065 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935602 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046122 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046122 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G01N33/53 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/53 (EP,US);
G01N35/00693 (EP,US);
G01N11/04 (EP,US);
G01N2011/008 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6439 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00702 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/967 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S435/971 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES STATUSES VON EINEM NACHWEISVERFAHREN | [2000/43] | English: | METHODS FOR MONITORING THE STATUS OF ASSAYS | [2000/43] | French: | METHODES DE CONTROLE DE DOSAGES | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 29.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05076405.9 / EP1602929 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Request for further processing for: | 04.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.2001 | 31.01.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2006 | BE | 15.11.2006 | CH | 15.11.2006 | CY | 15.11.2006 | FI | 15.11.2006 | IT | 15.11.2006 | LI | 15.11.2006 | NL | 15.11.2006 | IE | 04.01.2007 | LU | 04.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | DK | 15.02.2007 | SE | 15.02.2007 | GR | 16.02.2007 | PT | 16.04.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 04.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 04.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
BE | 15.11.2006 | ||
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0153283 (SYN TEK AB [SE]) [A] 1-7* claim 6 *; | [A]WO9709678 (MEMORIAL HOSPITAL [US]) [A] 56 * claim 7 * |