EP1058627 - ANTINOISE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE, PARTICULARLY MOTOR VEHICLE, FUEL TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOGUET, Jean, Louis 7, sente du Fond des Riais F-78570 Andrésy / FR | 02 /
SALLIOT, Didier 4, rue Georges Bourgoin F-78260 Achères / FR | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | De Cuenca, Emmanuel Jaime PSA Automobiles SA VEIP - VV1400 Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | De Cuenca, Emmanuel Jaime PSA Peugeot Citroen Propriété Industrielle DTAT/MPG/BPI - Service Brevets 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 99901636.3 | 28.01.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999FR00159 | Priority number, date | FR19980002254 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9802254 | [2000/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943510 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058627 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058627 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/077 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B60K15/077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GERÄUSCHMINDERUNG FÜR DEN KRAFTSTOFFTANK EINES FAHRZEUGES, INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2000/50] | English: | ANTINOISE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE, PARTICULARLY MOTOR VEHICLE, FUEL TANK | [2000/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTIBRUIT POUR RESERVOIR A CARBURANT DE VEHICULE, NOTAMMENT AUTOMOBILE | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 07.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Request for further processing for: | 07.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 07.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 24.07.2002 | SE | 24.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2004/05] |
Former [2003/21] | PT | 24.07.2002 | |
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 24.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE411421 (VOGTLAENDISCHE MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 1,3,5,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE861969 (SPAHL EMIL) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2806622 (LEIRER GORDON H) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB2275454 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 10 - line 20 * * page 4, line 3 - line 5 * |