EP1053163 - STEERING COLUMN WITH TORQUEMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/47] | LEN | ||
[2004/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.N.R. ROULEMENTS 1, rue des Usines F-74010 Annecy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states SNR ROULEMENTS 1, rue des Usines F-74010 Annecy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states SNR ROULEMENTS 1, rue des Usines F-74010 Annecy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICOT, Christophe 100, rue de la Prairie F-74330 Epagny / FR | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Keib, Gérard NOVAGRAAF IP 3, avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Keib, Gérard BREDEMA 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/47] | Keib, Gérard Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99901701.5 | 03.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999FR00228 | Priority number, date | FR19980001292 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9801292 | [2000/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939965 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053163 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053163 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/16, B62D5/04 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
B62D1/10 (EP,US);
B62D1/16 (EP,US);
B62D6/10 (EP,US);
G01L3/1428 (EP,US);
G01L5/221 (EP,US);
B60K2360/685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/47] | Title | German: | LENKSÄULE MIT DREHMOMENTSENSOR | [2000/47] | English: | STEERING COLUMN WITH TORQUEMETER | [2004/17] | French: | COLONNE DE DIRECTION A COUPLEMETRE | [2000/47] |
Former [2000/47] | LEN | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2478004 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]); | [DY]EP0442091 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]FR2718699 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]); | [DA]WO9708527 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]); | [A]EP0775624 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) |