EP0979418 - CIRCUIT WITH INTERCONNECT TEST UNIT AND A METHOD OF TESTING INTERCONNECTS BETWEEN A FIRST AND A SECOND ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JONG, Franciscus G., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MURIS, Mathias N., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RAAYMAKERS, Robertus M., W. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
LOUSBERG, Guillaume E., A. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Gravendeel, Cornelis, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Gravendeel, Cornelis, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99901802.1 | 29.01.1999 | [2000/07] | WO1999IB00172 | Priority number, date | EP19980200288 | 02.02.1998 Original published format: EP 98200288 | EP19980201482 | 06.05.1998 Original published format: EP 98201482 | EP19980204042 | 30.11.1998 Original published format: EP 98204042 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9939218 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0979418 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979418 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
G01R31/31855 (EP,US);
G11C29/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/07] | Title | German: | SCHALTKREIS MIT EINER EINHEIT ZUM TESTEN VON VERBINDUNGEN UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN VON VERBINDUNGEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ERSTEN UND ZWEITEN ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTKREIS | [2003/12] | English: | CIRCUIT WITH INTERCONNECT TEST UNIT AND A METHOD OF TESTING INTERCONNECTS BETWEEN A FIRST AND A SECOND ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT | [2000/07] | French: | CIRCUIT AVEC MODULE DE CONTROLE D'INTERCONNEXIONS ET PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DES INTERCONNEXIONS ENTRE UN PREMIER ET UN SECOND CIRCUIT ELECTRONIQUE | [2000/07] |
Former [2000/07] | SCHALTKREIS MIT EINER EINHEIT ZUM TESTEN VON VERBINDUNGEN UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN VON VERBINDUNGEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ZWEITEN ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTKREIS | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 20.08.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2278689 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]); | [A]EP0588507 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) |