EP1044337 - ROLLING ELEMENT BEARING HAVING A COOLING CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF Engineering & Research Centre B.V. P.O. Box 2350 3430 DT Nieuwegein / NL | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSON, Bo, Olov Reallinjen 20 S-224 73 Lund / SE | 02 /
IOANNIDES, Eustatios Montessorilaan 9 NL-3706 TB Zeist / NL | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99901995.3 | 11.01.1999 | [2000/42] | WO1999NL00012 | Priority number, date | WO1998NL00018 | 09.01.1998 Original published format: PCT/NL98/00018 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935414 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044337 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/38, F16C33/46 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
F16C37/007 (EP);
F16C33/3843 (EP);
F16C33/4623 (EP);
F16C33/6614 (EP);
F16C19/06 (EP);
F16C19/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/42] | Title | German: | WÄLZLAGER MIT EINEM GEKÜHLTEM KÄFIG | [2000/42] | English: | ROLLING ELEMENT BEARING HAVING A COOLING CAGE | [2000/42] | French: | ROULEMENT A ROULEAUX EQUIPE D'UNE CAGE DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 01.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/12] | 04.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR500449 (PIERRE LOUIS LIGEZ [FR]) [X] 1-9,13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1030629 (KURT FAEDLER, et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]GB961581 (FAFNIR BEARING CO) [X] 1-7,12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2107436 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US3674356 (ZENESKI EDMUND A) [X] 1-7,10,12,13,15 * column W *; | [A]FR2191661 (FERODO SA [FR]) [A] 1-7,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3860302 (GREGG WOODROW W) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]FR2389036 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2548297 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [X] 1-7,9,11-13,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4797014 (NICOLICH PATRICK [DE]) [A] 1,2,13,14 * column W *; | [X]DE4133296 (HERTER TAMARA [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11 * column 1, line 36 - line 41; claim 3 *; | [X]DE19530903 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,12,13,15 * column 3, line 54 - line 60 * |