EP0976211 - INFRASTRUCTURE FOR WIRELESS LANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville New York 11742-1300 / US | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, New York 11742-1300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEACH, Robert 1850 Middleton Avenue Los Altos, CA 94204 / US | 02 /
SCHWEDE, Heiner 653 Jay Street Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Kopf, Korbinian Paul, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Kopf, Korbinian Paul, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/05] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99902235.3 | 14.01.1999 | [2000/05] | WO1999US00761 | Priority number, date | US19980071302P | 16.01.1998 Original published format: US 71302 P | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937047 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976211 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976211 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/02, H04L12/28 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
H04L12/4625 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W52/0203 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | H04J3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | INFRASTRUKTUR FÜR DRAHTLOSE LANS | [2000/05] | English: | INFRASTRUCTURE FOR WIRELESS LANS | [2000/05] | French: | INFRASTRUCTURE POUR RESEAUX LOCAUX SANS FIL | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 15.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 04.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07004012.6 / EP1783937 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2008/40] | deleted | ||
Former [2008/17] | SE | 31.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5461627 (RYPINSKI CHANDOS A [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * column 4, line 45 - column 7, line 2; figures 1,3,5 * * page 7, lines 54-67 * * column 8, lines 60-67 * * column 11, line 52 - column 12, line 2 * * column 12, line 40 - column 13, line 31 * * column 14, lines 2,3 * * column 15, lines 19-30 * * column 23, line 57 - column 24, line 47 * [Y] 3-5,9,10; | [Y]WO9623377 (INTECOM INC [US]) [Y] 3-5,9,10 * page 13, lines 4-11 * * page 16, line 26 - page 17, line 14 * * page 19, line 18 - page 20, line 16 * * page 21, lines 10-21 * * page 24, lines 12-17 * * page 32, line 16 - page 33, line 3 * * page 33, lines 12,18 * * page 34, lines 18,21 * * page 54; figure 1; claim 13 *; | [A]US5504746 (MEIER ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 42; figure 1 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, lines 39-57 * * column 5, lines 14-17,39-41 * * column 6, lines 45-60 * * column 7, lines 1,2,25-42 * * column 8, lines 18-20 * * column 9, lines 8-10 * | [X] - RYPINSKI C A, "Motivation for centralized wireless LAN functions", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 1992. PROCEEDINGS, PIMRC '92., THIRD IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BOSTON, MA, USA 19-21 OCT. 1992, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19921019), ISBN 0-7803-0841-7, pages 153 - 158, XP010107109 [X] 1,8 * page 153, paragraph ABSTRACT * * page 153, column R, lines 18-42 * * page 156, column L, lines 10-14 * * page 157, column R, lines 11-14 * * page 158, column R, lines 4-6,18-23 * * page 155, column L, lines 34-45 * * page 155, column R, lines 9-42 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.1992.279945 | International search | [X]US5339316 (DIEPSTRATEN WILHELMUS J M [NL]); | [X]US5502726 (FISCHER MICHAEL [US]) |