EP0988091 - IMPROVED PULSED ELECTROMAGNETIC ENERGY TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/13] | IMPROVED PULSED ELECTROMAGNETIC ENERGY TREATMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
[2009/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regenesis Biomedical, Inc. 1435 North Hayden Road Scottsdale, AZ 85257-3773 / US | [2002/02] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Amethyst Technologies, Inc. 1435 N. Hayden Road Scottsdale, AZ 85257 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGE, Frank, R. 10187 E. San Salvador Drive Scottsdale, AZ 85258 / US | 02 /
LOYA, Arthur, A. 510 S. Extension, No. 1037 Mesa, AZ 85210 / US | 03 /
RITZ, Mary, C. 10187 E. San Salvador Drive Scottsdale, AZ 85258 / US | 04 /
BRYANT, Robert, T. 1831 E. Apache Boulevard 154 Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/13] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99902275.9 | 15.01.1999 | [2000/13] | WO1999US00864 | Priority number, date | US19980071396P | 15.01.1998 Original published format: US 71396 P | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9936127 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0988091 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0988091 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/40 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
A61N1/40 (EP,US);
A61N1/326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG MITTELS PULSIERTER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER ENERGIE | [2009/15] | English: | IMPROVED PULSED ELECTROMAGNETIC ENERGY TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2009/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF AMELIORE DE TRAITEMENT PAR ENERGIE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE PULSEE | [2009/15] |
Former [2000/13] | VERBESSERTE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG MITTELS PULSIERTER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER ENERGIE | ||
Former [2000/13] | IMPROVED PULSED ELECTROMAGNETIC ENERGY TREATMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
Former [2000/13] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE AMELIORES DE TRAITEMENT PAR ENERGIE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE PULSEE | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.01.2009 | 26.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09009399.8 / EP2110157 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 06.07.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 06.07.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.12.1999 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 02.12.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 31.01.2006 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.2009 | BE | 21.10.2009 | CY | 21.10.2009 | DK | 21.10.2009 | IT | 21.10.2009 | NL | 21.10.2009 | IE | 15.01.2010 | LU | 15.01.2010 | GR | 22.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | ES | 01.02.2010 | FR | 01.02.2010 | PT | 22.02.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.01.2010 | ||
LU | 15.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | ES | 01.02.2010 | |
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 01.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US3543762 (KENDALL WILLIAM DENIS) [YD] 3-5 * abstract *; | [XY]US5186181 (FRANCONI CAFIERO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 20, line 32 - line 52 * * column 24, line 24 - line 48 * * column 29, line 20 - line 31 * * figures 1,3,9,17 * [Y] 3-5; | [X]EP0538510 (SYMTONIC SA [CH]) [X] 1,4* the whole document *; | [X]US5634939 (KUSTER NIELS [CH], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * column 4, line 10 - line 29 * * column 9, line 38 - line 56 * * figures 1,2,6 * | by applicant | US3043310 | US3181535 | US3543762 | US3670737 | US5584863 |