EP1050093 - PAIRED MULTI-LAYERED DIELECTRIC INDEPENDENT PASSIVE COMPONENT ARCHITECTURE RESULTING IN DIFFERENTIAL AND COMMON MODE FILTERING WITH SURGE PROTECTION IN ONE INTEGRATED PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X2Y Attenuators, L.L.C. 1812 Navy Street Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | For all designated states Anthony, Anthony A. 5064 Wolf Run Drive Erie, PA 16505 / US | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTHONY, Anthony, A. 5064 Wolf Run Drive Erie, PA 16505 / US | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Spreepalais am Dom Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2000/45] | Fritsche, Rainer, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99902340.1 | 16.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999US01040 | Priority number, date | US19980008769 | 19.01.1998 Original published format: US 8769 | US19980056379 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: US 56379 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937008 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050093 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/00, H03H1/00, H03H7/01 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
H01G4/35 (EP);
H02H9/00 (KR);
H03H1/0007 (EP);
H03H7/427 (EP);
H05K1/141 (EP);
H05K1/162 (EP);
H05K3/3436 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/45] | H02H9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | ARCHITEKTUR MIT PAARWEISE MEHRLAGIG ANGEORDNETEN DIELEKTRISCH UNABHÄNGIGEN PASSIVEN KOMPONENTEN ZUR DIFFERENTIAL- UND GLEICHTAKTFILTERUNG MIT ÜBERSPANNUNGSSCHUTZ IN EINER INTEGRIERTEN PACKUNG | [2000/45] | English: | PAIRED MULTI-LAYERED DIELECTRIC INDEPENDENT PASSIVE COMPONENT ARCHITECTURE RESULTING IN DIFFERENTIAL AND COMMON MODE FILTERING WITH SURGE PROTECTION IN ONE INTEGRATED PACKAGE | [2000/45] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE COMPOSANTS PASSIFS INDEPENDANTS DU DIELECTRIQUE MULTICOUCHES APPARIES PRODUISANT UN FILTRAGE DIFFERENTIEL ET EN MODE COMMUN AVEC PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURTENSIONS, CONTENUS DANS UN SEUL BOITIER INTEGRE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 29.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2009 | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/14] | 28.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 03.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3842374 (SCHLICKE H); | [A]US4262317 (BAUMBACH BERTRAM W); | [A]US4335417 (SAKSHAUG EUGENE C, et al) |