EP1056777 - LIGAND RECEPTORS AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLUCKSMANN, M., Alexandra 33 Summit Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 02 /
ROBISON, Keith 9 Cherokee Lane Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | White, Martin Paul, et al Fry Heath & Spence The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | White, Martin Paul, et al Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99902372.4 | 20.01.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999US01128 | Priority number, date | US19980013634 | 26.01.1998 Original published format: US 13634 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937679 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056777 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C12N15/70, C12N15/74, C12N15/79, C12N15/81 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
C07K14/70578 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Extension states | AL | 14.10.1999 | LT | 14.10.1999 | LV | 14.10.1999 | MK | 14.10.1999 | RO | 14.10.1999 | SI | 14.10.1999 | Title | German: | LIGANDENREZEPTOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2000/49] | English: | LIGAND RECEPTORS AND USES THEREFOR | [2000/49] | French: | RECEPTEURS DE LIGANDS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 14.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/18] | 21.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 11.10.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 11.10.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ADAMS MD ET AL., EMBL, (19930807), Database accession no. T09060, XP002219586 [X] 1-14,17,18 * the whole document * | [A] - LEE N H ET AL, "MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF G-PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTORS", DRUG NEWS AND PERSPECTIVES, XX, XX, (19930901), vol. 6, no. 7, ISSN 0214-0934, pages 488 - 497, XP000677175 [A] 1-14,17,18 * the whole document * | [L] - URBAN S ET AL, "Drosophila Rhomboid-1 defines a family of putative intramembrane serine proteases", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (20011019), vol. 107, no. 2, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 173 - 182, XP002219148 [L] 1-14,17,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00525-6 | [A] - LARHAMMAR D ET AL, "THE RECEPTOR REVOLUTION-MULTIPLICITY OF G-PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTORS", DRUG DESIGN AND DISCOVERY, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH, XX, (1993), vol. 9, no. 3/4, ISSN 1055-9612, pages 179 - 188, XP000996559 [A] 1-14,17,18 * the whole document * | [A] - HART A C ET AL, "INDUCTION OF CELL FATE IN THE DROSOPHILA RETINA: THE BRIDE OF SEVENLESS PROTEIN IS PREDICTED TO CONTAIN A LARGE EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN AND SEVEN TRANSMEMBRANE SEGMENTS", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, COLD SPRING HARBOR, NY, US, (199011), vol. 4, no. 11, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 1835 - 1847, XP001013350 [A] 1-14,17,18 * the whole document * | [PA] - WILSON S ET AL, "ORPHAN G-PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTORS: THE NEXT GENERATION OF DRUG TARGETS?", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, GB, (199812), vol. 125, no. 7, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1387 - 1392, XP001010584 [PA] 1-14,17,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0702238 | [L] - HANDY J, "SHOTGUN (SEQUENCING) WEDDING: CAN HUMAN GENE PATENTS AND SCIENCE LIVE HAPPILY EVER AFTER?", BIOTECHNOLOGY LAW REPORT, LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200012), no. 6, ISSN 0730-031X, pages 801 - 813, XP000995651 [L] 1-14,17,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/073003100750060521 | International search | [X] - ADAMS M. D., ET AL., "RAPID CDNA SEQUENCING (EXPRESSED SEQUENCE TAGS) FROM A DIRECTIONALLY CLONED HUMAN INFANT BRAIN CDNA LIBRARY.", NATURE GENETICS., Nature Publishing Group, NEW YORK, US, NEW YORK, US, (19930801), vol. 04., doi:10.1038/ng0893-373, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 373 - 380., XP000574910 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0893-373 | [A] - HATA S., ET AL., "CDNA CLONING OF A PUTUTATIVE G PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTOR FROM BRAIN.", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA . GENE STRUCTURE AND EXPRESSION., ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19950101), vol. 1261., doi:10.1016/0167-4781(95)00002-X, ISSN 0167-4781, pages 121 - 125., XP002920804 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4781(95)00002-X | [A] - HEIBER M., ET AL., "ISOLATION OF THREE NOVEL HUMAN GENES ENCODING G PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTORS.", DNA AND CELL BIOLOGY, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19950101), vol. 14., no. 01., ISSN 1044-5498, pages 25 - 35., XP002066093 | [A] - PROBST W. C., ET AL., "SEQUENCE ALIGNMENT OF THE G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR SUPERFAMILY.", DNA AND CELL BIOLOGY, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19920101), vol. 11., no. 01., ISSN 1044-5498, pages 01 - 20., XP002920805 |