EP0991351 - HEATING APPARATUS AND HEATING ELEMENT ASSEMBLY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Gerald, R., F. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HEFFORD, David, V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Williamson, Paul Lewis Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99902769.1 | 22.02.1999 | [2000/15] | WO1999IB00309 | Priority number, date | GB19980008634 | 24.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9808634 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955209 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991351 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991351 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/00, A47J27/21, A47J29/00, A47J37/12 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
A47J27/21041 (EP,US);
B29C65/3612 (EP,US);
B29C65/362 (EP,US);
B29C66/542 (EP,US);
B29C65/3676 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/15] | Title | German: | ERHITZUNGSGERÄT UNF FABRIKATIONSVERFAHREN EINES ERHITZUNGSELEMENTS | [2000/15] | English: | HEATING APPARATUS AND HEATING ELEMENT ASSEMBLY METHOD | [2000/15] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE D'UN ELEMENT DE CHAUFFAGE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | ES | 13.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4422442 (FRANZ GUTMANN [CH], et al); | [Y]US4801343 (TAMBA SHINICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4893718 (DELESPAUL FREDERIC [FR], et al); | [A]GB2291325 (PIFCO LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2318452 (OTTER CONTROLS LTD [GB]) |